Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 (SB0237/CH0211)
Title
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 (SB0238/CH0212)
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0236)
Title
State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348 /CH0680
Title
Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 (HB0210)
Title
State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237 /CH0211 (HB0206)
Title
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238 /CH0212 (HB0209)
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 /CH0042
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0043
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0206 (SB0237/CH0211) Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0209 (SB0238/CH0212) State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/07/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0210 (SB0236) State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/07/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1348 /CH0680 Maryland Program Evaluation Act - Revisions and Clarifications By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0236 (HB0210) State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0237 /CH0211 (HB0206) Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0238 /CH0212 (HB0209) State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0283 /CH0042 Annual Curative Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0284 /CH0043 Annual Corrective Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM