Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier (By Request - Baltimore County Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Legalizing the 2015 Edition of the Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws and any supplement to the extent to which that code or supplement contains laws enacted by the General Assembly.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0183
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM