Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators King, Ferguson, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Klausmeier, Miller, Peters, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Zirkin, Colburn, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Getty, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Kittleman, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, and Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding prekindergarten services to specified 4-year-old children; establishing the Prekindergarten Expansion Grant Program; requiring the administration of the Program as a competitive grant program for specified providers; requiring a specified report on the aggregate estimated number of 3-year-old children and the subcategory that includes the estimated number of 3-year-old and 4-year old children from an economically disadvantaged background in each county in the State for the current school year and the next 5 school years; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0297
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {359232/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {513428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695664/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-35)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {359232/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {513428/1 Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 43
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {695664/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-35) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-217, 7-101.1, 7-101.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM