Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Astle, Conway, Frosh, Glassman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Ferguson, Young, Simonaire, Rosapepe, and Benson
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Designating specified areas of the State as State wildlands.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0296
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564238/1
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564238/1
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564238/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-29)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {564238/1 22
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Laid Over (Senator Edwards) Adopted 22
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {564238/1 23
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 23
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {564238/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26
House 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 29
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (106-29) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM