Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy Program - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Expedited Partner Therapy Program in the Baltimore City Health Department as a permanent program; authorizing a specified advanced practice registered nurse instead of a certified nurse practitioner to dispense or otherwise provide antibiotic therapy under specified circumstances; repealing a specified reporting requirement; repealing the termination date of the Program; and making conforming and clarifying changes.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0228
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {644034/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {644034/1 Report Adopted 36
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 38
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 40
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 72
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-214.1 )
(   2007, 2010 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM