Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Athletic Commission in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Commission; and requiring that an evaluation of the Commission and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Commission be performed on or before December 15, 2028.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1099
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Economic Matters 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Text - Chapter - State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page