Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electrical Inspectors and Plumbing Inspectors - Master License Required
Sponsored by
Senators Colburn, Dyson, Benson, Getty, Jacobs, Jennings, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Pipkin, and Shank
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a county or local government to employ as electrical inspectors only individuals who hold, or have previously held within the past 5 years under specified circumstances, a State license or local license, as applicable, to provide electrical services as a master electrician or who are certified by specified entities; requiring a county or local government to employ as plumbing inspectors only individuals who hold a master plumber license issued by specified entities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {814738/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-103, 12-503, 6-101, 6-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM