Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Deadly Weapons on School Property - Public and Private Schools
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from carrying or possessing a deadly weapon on public or private school property; and extending specified exceptions that allow the carrying or possession of a deadly weapon on public school property to private school property.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM