Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $1,500,000 to $6,000,000, a specified statutory minimum grant to Baltimore City, payable from the State's share of the proceeds of Program Open Space, for specified purposes related to Program Open Space; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to increase the grant each fiscal year by applying the growth in a specified consumer price index to the amount of grants received in the prior fiscal year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0631
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM