Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System if the individual has been separated from employment for more than 4 years, by June 30, 2011, has accrued the minimum amount of eligibility service needed to be eligible for a vested allowance, and by June 30, 2016, has returned to employment in a position included in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System; providing for the retroactive application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1121
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {129038/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-22)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments {129038/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Appropriations 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (115-22) 58
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM