Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $28,500,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Carroll County, including water and sewer projects, to finance loans for fire or emergency-related equipment, buildings, and other facilities of volunteer fire departments in the County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0574
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Senate 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 29
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 29
Text - Third - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Referred Appropriations 33
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM