Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Commercial Bingo - Permits
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Ferguson, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, and Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a commercial instant bingo permit in Baltimore City; authorizing the Bureau of Revenue Collections to issue a permit to an entity that meets specified requirements; specifying that for commercial purposes the permit holder may resume operating games of instant bingo in a specified manner under specified circumstances; and requiring the Bureau to adopt regulations to carry out the Act.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1139 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Commercial Bingo - Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore City - Commercial Bingo - Permits
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-502, 13-507, 13-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM