Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Dyson, Forehand, Garagiola, Getty, Glassman, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Mathias, McFadden, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Raskin, Robey, and Stone
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Sickle Cell Disease Research Program to be administered by the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide grants for sickle cell disease research projects; establishing the purposes of the Program; establishing specified types of grants to be awarded under the Program; establishing the Sickle Cell Disease Research Fund in the Corporation; providing for the purpose and composition of the Fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0726
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1026 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {847876/1
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {847876/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {847876/1 31
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Laid Over (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 31
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {847876/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 37
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-463 through 10-468 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM