Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Senators (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court to notify the Motor Vehicle Administration of a specified violation of the Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law; requiring the Chief Judge of the District Court and the Administrative Office of the Courts, in conjunction with the Administration, to establish specified procedures; requiring that a specified number of driver's license points be assessed against an individual who is convicted of a violation of the Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0386
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0271 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568572/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568572/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-5)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {152816/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (117-16)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Senators Gladden, Muse, and Shank
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Delegates Carter, Clippinger, and McComas
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-17)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {568572/1 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 42
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {568572/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (37-5) 45
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {152816/2 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (117-16) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Senators Gladden, Muse, and Shank 59
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 House Refuses to Recede 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Delegates Carter, Clippinger, and McComas 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (121-17) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-110 )
(   16-402, 26-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM