Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Oaks, Robinson, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting individuals who apply for alcoholic beverages licenses for the use of a partnership, corporation, club, or limited liability company in Baltimore City from requirements of being a resident and registered voter in the City; establishing certain requirements for the issuance of an alcoholic beverages license to a partnership, corporation, club, or limited liability company in Baltimore City; and altering a certain requirement for certain residents who sign a certain petition.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0448
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1086 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574935/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943592/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {574935/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages License - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {943592/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-102, 12-1401, 12-1401.1, 12-1402, 12-1405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page