Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Senators Oaks and Robinson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the period during which the Maryland Stadium Authority and Baltimore City must contribute certain amounts to the annual operating deficits of the Baltimore Convention facility and $200,000 each year to a capital improvement reserve fund; and extending to December 31, 2029, the date after which Baltimore City is solely responsible for all operating deficits and capital improvements for the Baltimore Convention facility.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0311
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Appropriations 38
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Text - Chapter - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM