Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Raskin, Guzzone, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations to provide for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas in the State on or before October 1, 2016; prohibiting specified regulations adopted by the Department from becoming effective until October 1, 2017; prohibiting the Department from issuing a permit for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas in the State until October 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0449
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514236/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514236/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {973125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-36)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2015
Legislative Date
5/30/2015
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {514236/1 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {514236/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {973125/1 Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (103-36) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/28/2015 5/30/2015 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM