Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsored by
Senators Forehand, Benson, Kelley, and Madaleno
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court to issue a permanent final protective order against an individual who is sentenced to, instead of who served, a term of imprisonment of at least 5 years for a specified act of abuse under specified circumstances and who has served at least 12 months of the sentence; altering the crimes, the commission of which subjects an individual to the issuance of a permanent final protective order against the individual in specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0853
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {328070/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {328070/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Judiciary 51
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-203 )
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM