Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/18/2021 9:02:15 AM
Monday, January 18, 2021
Monday, January 18, 2021
Senate
Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 18, 2021 8:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0360
Sen Rosapepe

State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
SB0363
Sen McCray

Courts – Improperly Summoning a Police Officer – Civil Liability
SB0364
Sen McCray

Baltimore City – Civil Claims Against Law Enforcement Officers of an Institution of Higher Education – Prohibition Against Nondisclosure Provision in Settlement Agreement
SB0369
Sen Peters

Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
SB0394
Sen Carter

Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
SB0401
Sen Carter

Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
SB0402
Sen Carter

Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal

Change made: January 18, 2021 8:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2021 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0368
Sen Peters

Speed Monitoring Systems – Municipal Corporations – Authorization
SB0373
Sen Reilly

Vehicle Laws – Suspension of Driver’s License or Vehicle Registration – Unpaid Judgments
SB0377
Sen Kagan

Vehicle Laws – Rental Vehicles – Provision of Spare Tires
SB0388
Sen Cassilly

Vehicle Registration – Disability Plates – Parking Meter Fees
SB0397
Sen Carter

Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
SB0408
Sens Kramer and Zucker

Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties

Change made: January 18, 2021 8:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0383
Sen Cassilly

Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures
SB0385
Sen Cassilly

Organized Retail Theft
SB0395
Sen Carter

Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
SB0400
Sen Carter

Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
SB0406
Sen Augustine

Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees