Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, Guzzone, Jennings, Klausmeier, Peters, Pugh, Reilly, Young, Feldman, Middleton, and Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, under specified circumstances, from authorizing work activities centers and specified sheltered workshops to pay employees with disabilities less than a specified minimum wage; authorizing specified work activities centers and specified sheltered workshops to pay new employees less than the minimum wage only under specified circumstances; requiring the Development Disabilities Administration and the Department of Disabilities to develop and implement a specified plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0420
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016, October 1, 2020, October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Mathias) {613120/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {583895/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (111-26)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {447479/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Mathias) Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Mathias) {613120/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {583895/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (111-26) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1012, 7-1013, 7-1014, 7-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM