Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment for Nail Technicians - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Kagan, Kelley, and Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified provision of the unemployment insurance law that provides that work is not covered employment under specified circumstances when performed by specified individuals who hold a limited license to provide nail technician services.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment for Nail Technicians - Repeal
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM