Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Benson, Currie, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War; requiring the Commission, in consultation with certain persons, to conduct research to advance the documentation of African American patriots in the American Revolutionary War; requiring the Commission to determine and send to the county boards of education certain information; requiring the Commission to develop and print a certain publication; terminating the Act as of September 30, 2023; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0597
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-106, 7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM