Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the tax collector in Baltimore City to withhold specified owner-occupied residential property from a tax sale when the taxes on the property are under $750; exempting a person redeeming specified owner-occupied residential property in Baltimore City from the requirement that the person pay the tax collector any taxes, interest, and penalties accruing after the date of the tax sale; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1035
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {749338/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {749338/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-801, 14-811, 14-828, 14-833, 14-843, 14-844, 14-849.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM