Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Elfreth, Ellis, Kagan, Lam, Sydnor, Washington, Young, and Hettleman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Higher Education to require certain institutions of postsecondary education to refund all tuition and fees to certain Maryland students under certain circumstances; establishing that an institution that closes programs in a manner that is a disorderly closure is in violation of the enrollment agreement or other contract with an enrolled student; authorizing the Commission to approve a certain plan for the of filing certain records of former students with a certain successor institution; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0469
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204932/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {653026/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-8)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Solomon) Adopted (110-18)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-32)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {204932/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Floor Amendment {653026/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (15-31) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (36-8) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Appropriations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {814161/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Solomon) Adopted (110-18) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (98-32) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Text - Chapter - Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
(   13-301 )
(   11-107, 11-203, 11-210, 11-401 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page