Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the termination date applicable to certain provisions relating to the purpose, use, and funding of the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund from June 30, 2022, to June 30, 2027.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0631
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Second Reading Passed 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page