Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty
Sponsored by
Senators Robey, Brochin, Forehand, Jacobs, Muse, Raskin, and Stone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the elements of a specified prohibition so as to prohibit the act of persuading or enticing from home and knowingly secreting or harboring or aiding in the secreting or harboring of an individual under age 16 for the purpose of committing a specified sexual crime; reclassifying the offense from a misdemeanor to a felony; increasing from 10 to 25 years the maximum term of imprisonment for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0701
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {508574/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {112413/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {508574/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments {112413/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senators Zirkin, Brochin, and Shank 65
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 House Refuses to Recede 70
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66A
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66A
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 66A
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM