Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin, Raskin, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, Madaleno, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Voiding as against public policy a provision of a specified contract or agreement that attempts or purports to waive specified rights or reduce specified liability for injury, death, or loss to person or property caused by the hydraulic fracturing activities of a specified permitee; providing for the treatment of specified information relating to a chemical constituent used in hydraulic fracturing for the purposes of a specified action; authorizing a specified plaintiff to recover specified economic and noneconomic damages; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {608173/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {608173/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {963422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {473424/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Edwards) Adopted (31-15)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {473424/1 Rejected (20-26)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {653424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {493824/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Waugh) Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {608173/1 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Laid Over (Senator Edwards) Adopted 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {608173/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {963422/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {473424/1 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Edwards) Adopted (31-15) 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {473424/1 Rejected (20-26) 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {653424/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {493824/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Waugh) Rejected (13-32) 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 48
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 52
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2101 through 3-2105 )
(   14-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM