Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the fees health care providers and hospitals may charge for copying and mailing specified medical records and for retrieving and preparing specified medical records; authorizing specified hospitals and other health care providers to charge specified fees and a specified cost for electronic copies of medical records that are in an electronic format requested by a person in interest or any other authorized person; providing that specified fees may not be adjusted annually for inflation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0724
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {607670/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {266287/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {607670/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {266287/1 Report Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 71
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) 72
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM