Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsored by
Senators Dyson, Astle, Colburn, Conway, Jacobs, Madaleno, Manno, Pinsky, Pipkin, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing an individual or corporation a $1 credit against the State income tax for each bushel of oyster shells recycled during the taxable year; providing that the credit may not exceed $750 during a taxable year; requiring the Department of Natural Resources and the Comptroller jointly to adopt regulations to authorize businesses, landfills, and nonprofit organizations to verify the amount of oyster shells recycled by each individual or corporation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0184
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {245467/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Senators Colburn, Robey, and Madaleno
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Delegates Barve, Branch, and Afzali
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Second Reading Passed 40
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 First Reading Ways and Means 45
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {245467/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Senators Colburn, Robey, and Madaleno 65
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 House Refuses to Recede 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Delegates Barve, Branch, and Afzali 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/07/2013 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-724.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM