Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Generally curing previous Acts of the General Assembly with possible title defects.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Annual Curative Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Annual Curative Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Annual Curative Bill
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Annual Curative Bill
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Annual Curative Bill
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text - Chapter - Annual Curative Bill
(   21-1001, 21-601, 21-602, 21-604, 21-701, 21-801, 21-802, 21-803, 21-805, 21-902, 21-903, 21-904, 21-905, 2-202 )
(   3-1301, 3-1302, 3-1307, 3-1308, 5-301 )
(   5-601 )
(   11-202.1, 18-1402, 24-1108, 7-426.4 )
(   14-101 )
(   10-723 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page