Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Community-Partnered School Behavioral Health Services Programs - Reporting System and Report (School Behavioral Health Accountability Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Lee, McFadden, Muse, Raskin, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, county boards of education, and other stakeholders, to develop and implement a standardized reporting system to determine the effectiveness of community-partnered school behavioral health services programs, not including school-based health centers; requiring the Department to report to the Governor and General Assembly on the effectiveness of the specified health services programs by December 1, 2017, and every 2 years thereafter; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0713
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554036/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {554036/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 38
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-438 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM