Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting specified errors or omissions in specified articles of the Annotated Code and in specified uncodified laws; clarifying language; correcting specified obsolete references; reorganizing specified sections of the Annotated Code; ratifying specified corrections made by the publishers of the Annotated Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Favorable Adopted 24
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Second Reading Passed 24
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 26
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 29
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 39
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 41
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Returned Passed 40
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-202, 13-1201, 17-401, 21-1103, 21-1104, 21-1105, 21-1406, 21-2004, 21-2006, 21-403, 21-404, 21-405, 21-903, 21-904, 25-1405, 25-1406, 25-405, 26-1405, 33-602, 33-604, 33-802, 33-804, 33-902, 33-904, 3-603 )
(   10-907, 2-508.1, 9-101 )
(   3-314, 7-103 )
(   18-402, 18-601, 23-503, 3-13A-02, 3-1401, 7-203.3, 8-405, 9.5-307, 9.5-316, 9.5-401, 9.5-404, 9.5-604 )
(   14-101, 5-1002, 9-503 )
(   4-202.1, 6-817, 9-349 )
(   15-603, 15-614, 17-202 )
(   10-119.3, 7-101 )
(   10-630, 13-1102, 15-1003, 21-1113, 21-2A-01, 21-2A-06, 3-403, 4-301, 4-302 )
(   12-102, 12-102.1, 12-102.2, 12-313, 12-413, 12-6B-09, 12-6D-11, 14-411.1, 3-206, 6-302, 6-308, 8-206, 8-508 )
(   15-112, 31-101 )
(   11-408, 2-102, 8-206, 9-801 )
(   1-401, 1-509, 7-307 )
(   10-302, 1-405, 4-215, 4-217, 4-611, 4-701, 4-713, 5-102 )
(   14-103, 14-501, 7-311 )
(   21-309.1, 22-406, 23-407 )
(   13-203, 13-912, 2-202, 4-102 )
(   16-205, 16-404.1, 2-103.7, 21-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM