Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the period of time, from 1 year to 2 years, by which a video lottery operation licensee must notify the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission of its intent to reapply for a video lottery operation license; altering the membership of specified video lottery facility local development councils to include 15 members appointed by the chief executive of the specified county, in consultation with the Senators and Delegates who represent the communities surrounding the facility and specified other entities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0093
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Term
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {739232/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Term
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {739232/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Ways and Means 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text - Chapter - Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership
(   9-1A-13, 9-1A-31 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page