Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by Jury
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a party to a specified wrongful detainer action brought in the District Court to demand a trial by jury in accordance with specified provisions of law, subject to a specified provision of law; making specified provisions of law regarding jury demands applicable to wrongful detainer actions; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by Jury
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {118772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by Jury
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by Jury
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {118772/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by Jury
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Judiciary 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
(   14-132, 8-118.1, 8-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page