Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing amendments to the Maryland Constitution increasing to 73 from 70 the mandatory retirement age for judges under specified circumstances; proposing an addition to the Maryland Constitution to provide for the application of specified amendments to the Maryland Constitution; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0481
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0847 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {898071/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-4)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {898071/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (40-4) 54
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2016 4/05/2016 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18B, 3, 3A, 41D, 5A )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM