Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland – Board of Regents and Quasi–Endowment Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Smith and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the unexpired or partial term of a member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland appointed to fill a vacancy does not qualify as a full term for the purposes of the prohibition against a member serving more than 2 consecutive full terms; authorizing the Board of Regents to make a one-time transfer of up to $25,000,000 from the non-State supported fund balance to a quasi-endowment fund; limiting the use of certain proceeds to certain purposes; and providing for the application of certain provisions.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0871
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {429230/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators King, Ferguson and Serafini)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators King, Ferguson and Serafini)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Jones, B. Barnes and Ciliberti)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Jones, B. Barnes and Ciliberti)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {693120/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {693120/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {429230/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Appropriations 38
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {314769/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators King, Ferguson and Serafini) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators King, Ferguson and Serafini) 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Refuses Recede 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Jones, B. Barnes and Ciliberti) 61A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Refuses Recede 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Jones, B. Barnes and Ciliberti) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Conference Committee Report {693120/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Conference Committee Report {693120/1 Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - University System of Maryland – Board of Regents and Quasi–Endowment Funds
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Text - Chapter - University System of Maryland – Board of Regents and Quasi–Endowment Funds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM