Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Instruction (Breanna's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Forehand, Gladden, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Stone, Zirkin, and Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a public school student to complete, as part of the health or physical education curriculum, instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation that includes hands-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator, beginning with students entering grade 9 in the 2015-2016 school year; requiring each county board of education to provide specified instruction in every public school that enrolls students in any of the grades 9 through 12, beginning in the 2015-2016 school year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1366
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274739/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2014 1/28/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {274739/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 43
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM