Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Generally curing previous Acts of the General Assembly with possible title or other defects.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Second Reading Passed 27
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 29
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 31
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 38
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 38
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 40
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Returned Passed 40
Post Passage 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-401, 5-202, 5-401, 6-301, 6-401, 9-216 )
(   4-102 )
(   4-125.1 )
(   4-202.1 )
(   8-6C-02, 8-6C-05, 8-6C-10 )
(   5-313, 5-511 )
(   14-108.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM