Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's County
Sponsored by
Senators Currie, Benson, Muse, Peters, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to establish a consumer affairs satellite office located in Prince George's County; providing for the purpose of establishing a consumer affairs satellite office; requiring the consumer affairs satellite office to provide consumers with specified resources; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to give specified consideration when determining the location of the consumer affairs satellite office; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0480
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0234 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-35)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (96-35) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM