Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court
Sponsored by
Senators Gladden, Currie, and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that prohibits a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child to transfer the case to the juvenile court under specified circumstances; prohibiting the court from transferring a case to juvenile court if the child was convicted in an unrelated case excluded from juvenile court jurisdiction, or the alleged crime is murder in the first degree and the accused child was 16 or 17 years of age when the alleged crime was committed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1295
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {198279/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-46)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments {198279/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 50
House 3/24/2014 3/19/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (89-46) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-202, 4-202.1, 4-202.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM