Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fishing - Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement Fund
Sponsored by
Senators Colburn and Dyson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; applying a $10 surcharge to specified angler's licenses, commercial fishing licenses, and recreational fishing licenses; requiring that the surcharge be credited to the Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement Fund to finance specified enforcement activities of the Natural Resources Police; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1241
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): December 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-211, 4-604, 4-701, 4-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM