Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Morgan State University - Student Housing
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Veto sustained (0-45)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Board of Regents of Morgan State University from entering into any contract for student housing that is located in the 1500 block of Havenwood Road in Baltimore City unless the Hillen Road Improvement Association approves and the developer executes a specified memorandum of understanding; requiring the Board to give notice to specified committees of the General Assembly if it enters into a contract for student housing; specifying priorities in the distribution of housing to students; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754030/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {593026/2 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124863/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {213227/1 Rejected (46-86)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (113-22)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 3/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 4/10 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-45)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {754030/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {593026/2 Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {124863/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {213227/1 Rejected (46-86) 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (113-22) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 3/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 4/10 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Veto sustained (0-45)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM