Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Feldman, Guzzone, Manno, and Montgomery
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the statewide information technology master plan developed by the Secretary of Information Technology include a cybersecurity framework; and requiring that the Secretary consider materials developed by the National Institute of Standards and Technology in developing or modifying the cybersecurity framework.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0197 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 48
House 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM