Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution to Municipalities
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, King, Astle, Eckardt, Kagan, Peters, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the authorized uses of highway user revenues; requiring that specified additional distributions of highway user revenues be made in specified fiscal years to Baltimore City and, under specified circumstances, municipalities; requiring that specified additional distributions of highway user revenues be allocated among municipalities in a specified manner; repealing obsolete distributions and transfers of highway user revenues for specified fiscal years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0946
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution to Municipalities
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-402, 8-403, 8-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM