Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program
Sponsored by
Chair, Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program within the Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness; providing for the composition of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to explore options for providing State funding to provide low- or no-interest mortgages for families that spend not less than 30% of income on housing and that do not make more than a set amount of income, and to explore similar low- or no-interest mortgage programs in other jurisdictions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0815
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744839/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {744839/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workgroup on Funding for a Low- or No-Interest Mortgage Program
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Appropriations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page