Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Maryland Clean Water Fund - Annual Report
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Benson, Dyson, Ferguson, Jennings, Montgomery, Reilly, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to report on the status of the Maryland Clean Water Fund to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 15 of each year.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204538/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {204538/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 49
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM