Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Dyson, Conway, Benson, Ferguson, Jennings, Montgomery, Pinsky, Reilly, Simonaire, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating a Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving compensation; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding nutritional needs of the low-income, working poor, and unemployed populations of the Southern Maryland regions; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1019
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {234738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {240811/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {234738/1 Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 37
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {240811/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM