Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Request to Intervene
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, Hettleman, Hough, Ready, West, Salling, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the circuit court to provide notice to a child's foster parent, preadoptive parent, or caregiver of the right to intervene as a party in a certain proceeding except under certain circumstances; granting certain rights to certain individuals in certain proceedings; granting the right to intervene in certain proceedings and the right to obtain all nonprivileged information in documents pertaining to the placement of a child; requiring a party who asserts that information in a document is privileged is required to meet certain criteria; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0369
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908276/1
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {908276/1
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {908276/1
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908276/1
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes) Withdrawn
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {803123/2 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {603129/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 30
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Committee Amendment {908276/1 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 31
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Committee Amendment {908276/1 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 37
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 Adopted 37
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes) 37
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 37
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hayes) Adopted 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes) Withdrawn 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {803123/2 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {603129/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Request to Intervene
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 3:02 PM