Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsored by
Senators Jones-Rodwell, Madaleno, Forehand, Rosapepe, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kelley, King, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified level of funding for the Tobacco Use Prevention and Cessation Program; altering the tobacco tax rates on cigarettes and other tobacco products; requiring certain wholesalers of cigarettes and other tobacco products to report the amount of other tobacco products sold on a tobacco tax return; and defining certain terms.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0443
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0700 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-105, 12-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM