Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Astle, Benson, Brinkley, Colburn, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Getty, Gladden, Glassman, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; establishing a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund and a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority in the Department of Business and Economic Development; requiring the Governor to include a specified appropriation in the annual budget bill for specified fiscal years; requiring a specified institution of higher education to deposit specified qualified donations into specified research endowments within a specified time period; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0741
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609439/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {675263/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-36)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {609439/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 45
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations 47
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {675263/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-36) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-601 through 6-623 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM